Li, Ann Lih-Ing (CPSO#: 58421)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Aug 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 380
5 Fairview Mall Drive
North York ON  M2J 2Z1
Phone: (416) 222-0833
Fax: (416) 222-6895
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Bendale Acres Long Term Care Home
2920 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T8
Canada
Phone: (416) 397-7055
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Li Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 30 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Li ( CPSO# 58421 )

Business Address:
Suite 380
5 Fairview Mall Drive
North York ON  M2J 2Z1
Phone Number: (416) 222-0833

Business Address:
Bendale Acres Home for the Aged
2920 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T8
Phone Number: (416) 397-7000

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6000

Business Address:
The Scarborough Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 438-2911

Business Address:
Runnymede Healthcare Centre
625 Runnymede Road
Toronto ON  M6S 3A3
Phone Number: (416) 762-7316

Business Address:
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
80 College Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2E2
Phone Number: (416) 967-2617

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Runnymede Healthcare Centre Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective: 16 Oct 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANN LIH-ING LI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1988