Li Chang, Hector Hugo (CPSO#: 87125)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Oct 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Oct 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Victoria Regional
Health Centre
Department of Laboratory Services
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone: (705) 728-9090 Ext. 43209
Fax: (705) 739-5685
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H.H. Li Chang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 19 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Li Chang ( CPSO# 87125 )

Business Address:
Department of Laboratory Services
Royal Vistoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 728-9090

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HECTOR HUGO LI CHANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LI CHANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Oct 2014