Li, Chien Chuang (CPSO#: 69174)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 1997

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hakka, Hindi, Mandarin

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Taunton Health Centre
1290 Keith Ross Court
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Phone: (905) 723-8551 Ext. 5401
Fax: (905) 721-6870
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chien Chuang Li Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 27 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Li ( CPSO# 69174 )

Business Address:
Taunton Health Centre
1290 Keith Ross Court
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Phone Number: (905) 723-8551

Business Address:
117 King Street East
Oshawa ON  L1H 1B9
Phone Number: (905) 723-8551

Business Address:
1450 Highway 2
Courtice ON  L1E 3C3
Phone Number: (905) 723-8551

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHIEN CHUANG LI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1997

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: February 18, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

Update as of August 4, 2017: The member has completed all elements of this SCERP.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the
disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)