Li, Christine Chee-Man (CPSO#: 100524)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2175 Sheppard Avenue East
Suite 303
Toronto ON  M2J 1W8
Phone: (416) 492-7700
Fax: (416) 492-5776
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTINE CHEE-MAN LI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2015