Li, Christopher Kevin (CPSO#: 78720)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jun 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Calgary, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Division of Respirology Room 6-045
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-6026
Fax: (416) 864-5649
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ellesmere Sleep Disorders Centre
2100 Ellesmere Road
Suite 326
Scarborough ON  M1H 3B7
Canada
Phone: (416) 439-0130
Fax: (416) 439-5508
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Sleep Care Solutions Scarborough
2025 Midland Ave
Suite 302
Toronto ON  M1P 3E2
Canada
Phone: (416) 292-3218
Fax: (416) 292-3200
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Toronto Sleep and Pulmonary Centre
123 Edward Street
Suite 1011
Toronto ON  M5G 1E2
Canada
Phone: (416) 813-2277
Fax: (416) 260-3203
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 16 Sep 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER KEVIN LI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Dec 2002 to 12 Jan 2003
Elective Trainee - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Jan 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2003