Li, Danni (CPSO#: 97470)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 26 Aug 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 26 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 07 May 2012 to 03 Jun 2012
Elective Trainee - Endocrinology and Metabolism

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 20 Jul 2012
Elective Trainee - Endocrinology and Metabolism

McMaster University, 30 Jul 2012 to 26 Aug 2012
Elective Trainee - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 May 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Jul 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Aug 2012