Li, Francis (CPSO#: 61146)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 14 Sep 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
751 Pape Avenue
Toronto ON  M4K 3T1
Phone: (416) 778-1810
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Francis Li Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 28 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Li ( CPSO# 61146 )

Business Address:
751 Pape Avenue
Toronto ON  M4K 3T1
Phone Number: (416) 778-1810

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 14 Sep 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 14 Sep 2016 Active View Details [+]


            As from September 14, 2016, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Francis Li, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Li to the College of
            Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                            ("Undertaking")
                                                  of
                                              FRANCIS LI
                                              ("Dr. Li")
                                                  to 
                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")



            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   I, Dr. Li, certificate of registration number 61146, am a member of the
                  College.  I am aware of the College's concern about protecting the
                  public.

            (2)   I, Dr. Li, am executing this Undertaking while College investigations
                  regarding my conduct are in process. I acknowledge that this Undertaking
                  does not resolve the current investigations.    

            (3)   I, Dr. Li, understand and agree that I am bound by the terms of this
                  Undertaking from the date on which I sign it.

            (4)   I, Dr Li, agree to be bound by the terms of this Undertaking until such
                  time as the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of the College
                  ("ICRC") disposes of the current investigations or, in the event that any
                  of them result in allegations being referred to the Discipline Committee,
                  until such time as the ICRC has had an opportunity to consider whether it
                  is appropriate to issue an interim order under  section 37 of the Health
                  Professions Procedural Code and, if so, to make such an order, or I have
                  executed a new Undertaking in a form acceptable to the College that is
                  specified to replace this Undertaking.  

            B.    UNDERTAKING 

            (5)   Practice Restrictions

                  (a)   I, Dr. Li, undertake that, effective immediately, I shall not
                        engage in any professional encounters with female patients of any
                        age, in any jurisdiction, unless the patient encounter takes place
                        in the presence of a monitor who is a female regulated health
                        professional acceptable to the College (the "Practice Monitor"),
                        and unless the other requirements provided in this Undertaking are
                        fulfilled. For further clarity, I understand that I may not be
                        alone with any female patient, for any length of time, during any
                        professional encounter, whether or not a friend or family member of
                        the patient is also present.  I acknowledge that, for the purposes
                        of this Undertaking, "patient" includes an individual with whom I
                        do not have a treating relationship, but who is or may be the
                        subject of a medical report by me to a third party. 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Li, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Practice Monitor's
                        undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A" and understand what is
                        required of the Practice Monitor, including, but not limited to:
                  
                        1.    providing reports (as described in the Practice Monitor's
                              undertaking) to the College on at least a monthly basis; 
                  
                        2.    remaining in the examination or consulting room at all times
                              during all professional encounters with all female patients; 
                  
                        3.    carefully observing all of my physical examinations of all of
                              my female patients, including but not limited to internal
                              examinations of female patients.  I further acknowledge my
                              obligation to ensure the Practice Monitor's view of all of my
                              physical examinations of female patients is unobstructed at
                              all times; 
                  
                        4.    refraining from performing any other functions, except those
                              required in the Practice Monitor's undertaking attached as
                              Appendix "A," while observing me in all my professional
                              encounters with female patients;
                  
                        5.    maintaining a log of all female patient encounters in the
                              form attached to this Undertaking as Appendix "B" (the "Log")
                              and in the manner described in Appendix "A";
                  
                        6.    initialing all corresponding entries in the records of
                              patients noted in the Log or, in the case of an electronic
                              medical record, making a note in the patient's electronic
                              medical record; and
                  
                        7.    submitting or arranging for submission of the original Log to
                              the College on a monthly basis.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Li, undertake and agree to maintain my own copy of the Log
                        at all times, and to make it available to the College upon request. 
                  
            (6)   I, Dr. Li, undertake to inform the College of each and every location
                  that I practise including, but not limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and
                  office(s), in any jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"),
                  within fifteen (15) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I
                  further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                  Locations within fifteen (15) days of commencing practice at that
                  location.

            (7)   I, Dr. Li, undertake that if my approved Practice Monitor is unable to
                  fulfill her duties due to illness or an emergency, I shall ensure that
                  another female regulated health professional, who need not be
                  pre-approved by the College, fulfills the duties of my Practice Monitor
                  on a temporary basis, not to exceed three (3) consecutive days.  I
                  further undertake that I will notify the College of the temporary
                  Practice Monitor's particulars, including her name, College membership
                  details, and contact information, within twelve (12) hours of her
                  commencing her duties. 

            (8)   Posting a Sign

                  (a)   I, Dr. Li, undertake to the College that, effective immediately, I
                        shall post a sign in the waiting room(s) and in each of my
                        examination and/or consulting rooms, in all of my Practice
                        Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, in the form
                        set out at Appendix "C" that states: "For all professional
                        encounters with female patients of any age, Dr. Li will have a
                        chaperone who is a female regulated health professional acceptable
                        to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario.  For further
                        clarity, Dr. Li will not be alone in any examination or consulting
                        room with any female patient. Further information may be found on
                        the College website at www.cpso.on.ca".
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Li, undertake to post certified translations in any
                        languages in which I provide services, of the sign described in
                        subparagraph B(8)(a), in my waiting room(s) and each of my
                        examination and/or consulting rooms, in all of my Practice
                        Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, in the form
                        set out at Appendix "C."
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Li, undertake to provide the certified translation(s)
                        described in subparagraph B(8)(b), to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of executing this Undertaking.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Li, undertake that if after executing this Undertaking I
                        elect to provide services in any other language(s), I will notify
                        the College prior to providing any such services.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Li, undertake to provide to the College the certified
                        translation(s) described in subparagraph B(8)(b) prior to beginning
                        to provide services in the language(s) described in subparagraph
                        B(8)(d).
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (9)   I, Dr. Li, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in
                  this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (10)  I, Dr. Li, undertake to abide by the terms and conditions of this
                  Undertaking and acknowledge that a breach of any term of this Undertaking
                  may constitute an act of professional misconduct and may result in a
                  referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee of the
                  College (the "Discipline Committee").

            (11)  I, Dr. Li, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for payment of
                  all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation
                  of any of the terms of this Undertaking.

            (12)  I, Dr. Li, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand the
                  terms and conditions provided in this Undertaking, and that I have
                  obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this
                  Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.

            (13)  I, Dr. Li, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Health Professions Procedural Code. I
                  understand that this entire Undertaking shall be information on the
                  College's Register that is available to the public during the time period
                  that the Undertaking remains in effect.

            (14)  I, Dr. Li, acknowledge that the following summary will appear on the
                  College's Register that is available to the public during the time period
                  that this Undertaking remains in effect:

                  Dr. Li is the subject of College investigations into his conduct.  Until
                  the investigations are resolved, Dr. Li has undertaken that:
                  
                        For all professional encounters with female patients of any age,
                        Dr. Li will have a chaperone who is a female regulated health
                        professional acceptable to the College of Physicians and Surgeons
                        of Ontario, and unless the other requirements provided in his
                        Undertaking to the College are fulfilled.  For further clarity, Dr.
                        Li must not be alone with any female patient during any
                        professional encounter. 
                  
                        Dr. Li shall post a sign in the waiting room(s) and in each
                        examination room and consultation room, in all his Practice
                        Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, that states:
                        "For all professional encounters with female patients of any age,
                        Dr. Li will have a chaperone who is a female regulated health
                        professional acceptable to the College of Physicians and Surgeons
                        of Ontario.  For further clarity, Dr. Li will not be alone in any
                        examination or consulting room with any female patient. Further
                        information may be found on the College website at www.cpso.on.ca." 
                  
                  
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (15)  I, Dr. Li, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate
                  enquiries of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan and/or any person who or
                  institution that may have relevant information, in order for the College
                  to monitor my compliance with the terms of this Undertaking.

            (16)  I, Dr. Li, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form
                  attached hereto as Appendix "D."

            (17)  I, Dr. Li, consent to submit to and not interfere with, unannounced
                  inspections of my Practice Location(s) and to the inspection of patient
                  charts by the College and to any other activity the College deems
                  necessary in order to monitor my compliance with the terms of this
                  Undertaking.

            (18)  I, Dr. Li, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to all Practice Monitors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (19)  I, Dr. Li, give my irrevocable consent to all Practice Monitors to
                  disclose to the College, and to one another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the terms of the Practice Monitor's undertaking set out
                        at Appendix "A"; and/or
                  
                  (c)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking.
                  
            (20)  I, Dr. Li, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief(s) of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities approved by the College, at any hospital or Practice
                  Location where I practise or have privileges ("Chief(s) of Staff"), and
                  to provide said Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has
                  that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or
                  any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this
                  Undertaking.


Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: September 14, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Francis Li to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective September 14, 2016:

Dr. Li is the subject of College investigations into his conduct. Until the investigations are resolved, Dr. Li has undertaken that:

For all professional encounters with female patients of any age, Dr. Li will have a chaperone who is a female regulated health professional acceptable to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, and unless the other requirements provided in his Undertaking to the College are fulfilled. For further clarity, Dr. Li must not be alone with any female patient during any professional encounter.

Dr. Li shall post a sign in the waiting room(s) and in each examination room and consultation room, in all his Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, that states: "For all professional encounters with female patients of any age, Dr. Li will have a chaperone who is a female regulated health professional acceptable to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario. For further clarity, Dr. Li will not be alone in any examination or consulting room with any female patient. Further information may be found on the College website at www.cpso.on.ca."


Source: Member
Active Date: July 22, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Criminal Charges:

Effective May 29, 2015,Where a member has been charged with an offence under the Criminal Code of Canada or the Ontario Health Insurance Act and the charge is outstanding and is known to the College, the College By-laws require certain information about the charge to be posted on the register.

The following are outstanding charges against this member, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information:

It is alleged that Francis Li on or about June 14, 2016, at the City of Toronto unlawfully did commit a sexual assault on XX, contrary to Section 271 of the Criminal Code of Canada.

Date of charges: June 15, 2016
Place of charges: Toronto, Ontario
Toronto Police