Li, Jennifer Zhirui (CPSO#: 97827)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
McMaster University
Room MDCL - 3101A
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tu Li Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 13 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Tu ( CPSO# 95356 )
Dr. J. Li ( CPSO# 97827 )

Business Address:
Postgraduate Medical Education
McMaster University
MDCL - 3101A
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
Suite 419
1 Young Street
Hamilton ON  L8N 1T8
Phone Number: (905) 906-2215

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER ZHIRUI LI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017