Li, Kan Wen (CPSO#: 68144)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Scarborough Hospital
Emergency Department
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone: (416) 4318181
Fax: (416) 431-8164
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Southlake Regional Health Centre
Emergency Department
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Canada
Phone: (905) 895-4521
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Li Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 30 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Li ( CPSO# 68144 )

Business Address:
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 438-2911

Business Address:
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Phone Number: (416) 495-2550

Business Address:
100 - 12 Morgan Avenue
Thornhill ON  L3T 1R1
Phone Number: (905) 695-5665

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Hospital
Emergency Department
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Business Address:
460 Comstock Road
Toronto ON  M1L 4S4
Phone Number: (416) 752-3636

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAN WEN LI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1996