Li, Kwok Hung (CPSO#: 61921)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 May 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 May 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hong Kong Baptist Hospital
Department of Pathology
222 Waterloo Road
Kowloon Hong Kong Hong Kong
Hong Kong S A R
Phone: 85223398925
Fax: 85223371658

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Hong Kong S A R

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 09 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KWOK HUNG LI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1990 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 31 Dec 1990
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1991 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 31 Dec 1991
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1992 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 31 Dec 1992
Resident 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1993 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Feb 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Oct 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Oct 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 May 1996