Li, Marilyn Man-Yee (CPSO#: 81103)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Medical Centre
707 Charlotte Street
Peterborough ON  K9J 7B3
Phone: (705) 874-1517
Fax: (705) 743-1449
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marilyn Li Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 20 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Li ( CPSO# 81103 )

Business Address:
The Medical Centre
707 Charlotte Street
Peterborough ON  K9J 7B3
Phone Number: (705) 874-1517

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 20 Oct 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARILYN MAN-YEE LI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2009 to 30 Aug 2010
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008