Li, Michael Mu (CPSO#: 98166)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St Joseph's Health Centre.
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Canada
Phone: 416-530-6000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael M. Li Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 26 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Li ( CPSO# 98166 )

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Business Address:
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 10 Nov 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL MU LI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2014