Li, Qiuyan (CPSO#: 65730)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Harbin Medical University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jun 1992 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1996