Li, Stephanie Karen (CPSO#: 73311)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Jun 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 12 Sep 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 05 Apr 1999 to 02 May 1999
Elective Trainee - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2002 to 30 Jun 2002
Elective Trainee - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 May 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 May 2002
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jun 2003