Li, Xiaobin (CPSO#: 92013)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Aug 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:Bowman Gray of Wake Forest University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1935 Bank Street
Ottawa ON  K1V 8A3
Phone: (613) 521-2391 Ext. 164
Fax: (613) 521-5443
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

117 Banting Dr
Deep River ON  K0J 1P0
Canada
Phone: (613) 584-3333
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07

7 St Francis Memorial Dr
Barrys Bay ON  K0J 1B0
Canada
Phone: (613) 756-3044
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07

Lady Minto Hospital
241 8th Street
Cochrane ON  P0L 1C0
Canada
County: Territorial District of Cochrane
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Xiaobin Li Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 12 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. X. Li ( CPSO# 92013 )

Business Address:
1935 Bank Street
Ottawa ON  K1V 8A3

Business Address:
117 Banting Drive
Deep River ON  K0J 1P0

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Deep River and District Hospital Deep River
Lady Minto Hospital Cochrane
St Francis Memorial Hospital Barrys Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. XIAOBIN LI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 28 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2009