Li, Yuanzhi Angela (CPSO#: 100467)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jul 2016
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jul 2016