Liang, Edmund Ka Kwun (CPSO#: 54297)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
9555 Yonge Street
Suite 403
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9M5
Phone: (905) 737-4853
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E.K.K. Liang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 08 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Liang ( CPSO# 54297 )

Business Address:
9555 Yonge Street
Suite 403
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9M5
Phone Number: (905) 737-4853

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 15 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EDMUND KA KWUN LIANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIANG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Rotating Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Other - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1985