Liang, Hsien-Cheng (CPSO#: 29131)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jun 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jun 1977

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 212
2425 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON  N8W 1E6
Phone: (519) 974-9700
Fax: (519) 974-3554
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R J Gajdowski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 31 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Liang ( CPSO# 29131 )
Dr. R. Gajdowski ( CPSO# 54511 )

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 997-3333


Corporation Name: Hsien-Cheng Liang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 10 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Liang ( CPSO# 29131 )

Business Address:
Suite 212
2425 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON  N8W 1E6
Phone Number: (519) 974-9700

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Mar 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HSIEN-CHENG LIANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIANG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1977