Liang, Kenneth Ka Chu (CPSO#: 57093)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
All Med Health
16880 Yonge Street
Unit 1
Newmarket ON  L3Y 0A3
Phone: (905) 895-9777
Fax: (905) 895-9720
Electoral District: 05

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KENNETH KA CHU LIANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIANG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1988