Liang, Lorna Lo Kwong (CPSO#: 29895)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Jan 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jan 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 May 1978
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Nov 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Jan 2013

Concerns

Source: QA Committee
Active Date: January 31, 2013
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Lorna Lo Kwong Liang has resigned from the College, effective January 31, 2013.