Liao, Horng-Miau Robert (CPSO#: 51917)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Nov 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Nov 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin, Taiwanese

Education:Kaohsiung Medical College, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 310B
4040 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1S 4V5
Phone: (416) 299-1484
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. H. Robert Liao Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 27 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Liao ( CPSO# 51917 )

Business Address:
310B - 4040 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1S 4V5
Phone Number: (416) 299-1484

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 23 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HORNG-MIAU ROBERT LIAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIAO is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Nov 1984