Liao, Patrick Manzano (CPSO#: 51999)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Feb 1984


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English, Filipino

Education:Cebu Institute of Medicine, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
King Street Medical Arts Centre
71 King Street West
Suite 302
Mississauga ON  L5B 4A2
Phone: (905) 566-0905
Fax: (905) 270-2826
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Patrick M. Liao Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 10 2008

Dr. P. Liao ( CPSO# 51999 )

Business Address:
King Street Medical Arts Centre
Suite 302
71 King Street West
Mississauga ON  L5B 4A2
Phone Number: (905) 566-0905

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Kansas

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga


Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 01 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. PATRICK MANZANO LIAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIAO is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Feb 1984