Liao, Sunu (CPSO#: 59237)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Mar 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Sep 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hakka

Education:University of Madras, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2901 Lawrence Avenue East
Suite 306
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T3
Phone: (416) 266-6155
Fax: (416) 266-2827
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUNU LIAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIAO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Mar 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 1993