Liashko, Vitaly Agafonikovich (CPSO#: 77061)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Leningrad Paediatric Medical Institute, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
135 Macbeath Avenue
Moncton NB  E1C 6Z8
Phone: (506) 857-5788

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003