Liaw, Yih-Chen (CPSO#: 23884)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Jul 1971

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Nov 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National Taiwan University, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Diagnostic Imaging Consultants
300 John Street
Thornhill ON  L3T 5W4
Phone: (905) 731-4001
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 14 Nov 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YIH-CHEN LIAW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIAW is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Feb 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Nov 2011