Libby, Thomas Phillip (CPSO#: 66492)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1995


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Brooklin Medical Centre
Suite 1A
5959 Anderson Street
Brooklin ON  L1M 2E9
Phone: (905) 655-3321
Fax: (905) 655-4848
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Fairview Lodge Home for the Aged
632 Dundas Street West
Whitby, Ontario
L1N 5S1
Whitby ON  L1N 5S1
Phone: 905 668 5851
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05


Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. THOMAS PHILLIP LIBBY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIBBY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1995