Liberman, Bruce Alan (CPSO#: 33295)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 21 Mar 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 21 Mar 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 07 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2010
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Jun 2011
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 21 Mar 2012

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 04 May 2011
Summary:

On May 4, 2011, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Liberman committed an act of 
professional misconduct in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession 
and engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct.   The Committee also 
found that Dr. Liberman is incompetent regarding his post-operative care of a liposuction patient. 
 
Regarding 55 patients at two cosmetic clinics, the Committee found that Dr. Liberman failed to 
maintain the standard of practice of the profession in not charting the vital signs of the patients 
on admission to the recovery room. 
 
Regarding the post-operative care of a liposuction patient and charting regarding this patient, the 
Committee found that Dr. Liberman failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession 
and engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable and unprofessional conduct: in his failure to 
aggressively treat the patient's hypovolemia; in his failure to call 911 when his initial treatment 
failed, and later when the patient became unconscious; in his failure to chart the initial recovery 
room vital signs and failure to chart his intervention prior to intubation. He also engaged in 
disgraceful, dishonourable and unprofessional conduct when he removed his September 20, 
2007, resuscitation note from the chart and replaced it with a note written the next day, and with 
regard to his misleading statements on the replacement resuscitation note. The Committee also 
found Dr. Liberman incompetent in his post-operative care of this patient. 
 
On March 21, 2012, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed that: 
 
1.    The Registrar revoke Dr. Liberman's certificate of registration, effective as of the date of 
      this Order. 
2.    Dr. Liberman appear before the Panel to be reprimanded, on a date to be fixed by the 
      Panel, which shall be no later than three months from the date that this Order becomes 
      final. 
3.    Dr. Liberman pay costs to the College in the amount of $62,050, within 6 months of the 
      date of this order 
. 
On April 19, 2012, Dr. Liberman appealed the decision of the Discipline Committee to the 
Divisional Court. In the circumstances, the decision of the Discipline Committee remains in 
effect despite the appeal. 
 
On June 13, 2013, the Divisional Court dismissed Dr. Liberman's appeal in its entirety.  
 
 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 13 Jun 2013
Hearing Date(s): June 14-18, June 28 & 30, July 19-23, September 15

Concerns

Source: Discipline Committee
Active Date: July 29, 2013
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Undertaking by Dr. Bruce Alan Liberman, to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (the “College”).

A. PREAMBLE

(1) I, Dr. Liberman, certificate of registration number 33295, was a member of the College between June 15, 1982 and March 21, 2012. My certificate of registration was revoked by the Discipline Committee of the College on March 21, 2012.


B. UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT

(2) I, Dr. Liberman, hereby undertake not to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician or for a certificate of registration to practise medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.


(3) I, Dr. Liberman, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand the terms and conditions provided in this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.

(4) I, Dr. Liberman, consent to the terms of this Undertaking being entered on the register as information that is available to the public.