Libman, Robert Nelson (CPSO#: 25680)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Jun 1973

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 1973

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Medical Center
2550A Finch Avenue West
Weston ON  M9M 2G3
Phone: (416) 749-5291
Fax: (416) 749-6598
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Libman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 20 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Libman ( CPSO# 32713 )
Dr. R. Libman ( CPSO# 25680 )

Business Address:
Medical Center
2550A Finch Avenue West
Weston ON  M9M 2G3
Phone Number: (416) 749-5291

Business Address:
2900 Steeles Avenue East
Suite 206
Thornhill ON  L3T 4X1
Phone Number: (905) 881-6667


Corporation Name: Dr. Joel Harold Isenberg Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 19 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Libman ( CPSO# 25680 )
Dr. J. Isenberg ( CPSO# 60031 )

Business Address:
17 Cedar Street North
Timmins ON  P4N 6H8

Business Address:
21 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B6
Phone Number: (905) 897-9228

Business Address:
Medical Centre
2550A Finch Avenue West
Weston ON  M9M 2G3

Business Address:
42 Second Street East
Kirkland Lake ON  P2N 1R1
Phone Number: (705) 567-7778

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Texas

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1976 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT NELSON LIBMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIBMAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1973