Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Librach, Clifford Lawrence (CPSO#: 52630)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Sep 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Create Fertility Centre
Suite 1100
790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone: (416) 323-7727
Fax: (416) 323-7334
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Clifford L. Librach Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 20 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Librach ( CPSO# 52630 )

Business Address:
Create Fertility Centre
1100 - 790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone Number: (416) 323-7727

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 01 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CLIFFORD LAWRENCE LIBRACH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIBRACH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 1984