Librach, Kevin Stuart (CPSO#: 63720)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Guelph Medical Place
83 Dawson Road
Guelph ON  N1H 1B1
Phone: (519) 766-1360
Fax: (519) 763-4315
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kevin S. Librach Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 28 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Librach ( CPSO# 63720 )

Business Address:
Guelph Medical Place
83 Dawson Road
Guelph ON  N1H 1B1
Phone Number: (519) 766-1360

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEVIN STUART LIBRACH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIBRACH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1992