Librach, Samuel (CPSO#: 15480)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian, Yiddish

Education:University of Toronto, 1952

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sam Librach Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 23 2014

Medical Records Location

Address: Effective Sept 1, 2013, records are to be stored at Records Management Ltd., 1 High Meadow Place, Unit 13, Toronto ON M9L 0A3
Instructions: Call toll free at 1.800.775.0093, or www.recordregistry.ca
Date Received: 29 Aug 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 10 Nov 1958 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 1955
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015