Lichtblau, Ethan (CPSO#: 70230)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Oct 1996


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian

Education:McGill University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5311 de Maisonneuve West
3rd Floor
Montreal QC  H4A 1Z5
Phone: (514) 483-1213
Fax: (514) 483-6386

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California
USA - New York


Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 12 Sep 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. ETHAN LICHTBLAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LICHTBLAU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Sep 1997
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 1996