Lichtenstein, Samuel Victor (CPSO#: 33743)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 04 Nov 1994

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Maryland, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 21 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery Effective: 27 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 1982
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 04 Nov 1994