Lickrish, Gordon Mclean (CPSO#: 22069)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Glasgow, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: c/o Dr. Jason Dodge 6th Floor Room 601 123 Edward Street Toronto ON M5G 1E2
Date Received: 18 Aug 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 01 Jan 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1964
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1967
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017