Licskai, Christopher James (CPSO#: 61070)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Aug 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 646-6405
Fax: (519) 685-8406
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Licskai Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 22 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Licskai ( CPSO# 61070 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Hospital
E6 205 - 800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 646-6405

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 15 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER JAMES LICSKAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LICSKAI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 5 - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 1990