Liddle, Jane Elizabeth (CPSO#: 62600)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Sep 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 107
900 Greenbank Road
Nepean ON  K2J 1S8
Phone: (613) 825-4655
Fax: (613) 825-2816
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Children's Hospital of Eastern
Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Canada
Phone: (613) 737-7600
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JANE ELIZABETH LIDDLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIDDLE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1990 to 14 Jun 1991
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 1992