Lie, Kay Ie (CPSO#: 26098)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Dutch, English, German, Indonesian

Education:Ruprecht Karl Univ of Heidelberg, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Sunnybrook Hospital Suite 703 2075 Bayview Ave. Toronto M4N 3MS
Date Received: 02 May 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 08 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1971
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017