Lieberman, Lani Denise (CPSO#: 73978)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jul 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Rouge Valley Hospital- Centenarry
2867 Ellesmere Road
Galaxy 12 Pediatric Clinic
MIE 4B9
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Phone: (416) 281 7476
Fax: (416) 281 7313
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

200 Elizabeth Street
3EC
Toronto, Ontario
M5G 2C4
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Canada
Phone: (416) 340 5390
Fax: (416) 340 5410
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Sunnybrook Health Sciences Center
2075 Bayview Avenue; B211
Toronto, ON
M4N 3M5
North York ON  M4N 3M5
Canada
Phone: 416 480 6100
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LANI DENISE LIEBERMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIEBERMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Sep 2006
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 7 - Transfusion Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 8 - Transfusion Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2003