Liebman, Shael Martin (CPSO#: 61176)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Mar 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 350
1720 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 5A6
Phone: (519) 255-9584
Fax: (519) 255-9908
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Liebman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 14 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Liebman ( CPSO# 61176 )

Business Address:
Suite 350
1720 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 5A6
Phone Number: (519) 255-9584

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 09 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHAEL MARTIN LIEBMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIEBMAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Mar 1991