Liepert, Douglas Robert (CPSO#: 60729)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 May 1991

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Queen's University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 02 Sep 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 May 1991