Lietaer, Lawrence Arsene (CPSO#: 22761)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Larry Lietaer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 12 2011

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Gastroenterology Effective: 17 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2011