Liew, Allan Syng-Luan (CPSO#: 66864)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital
Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 761-4534
Fax: (613) 761-4637
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Allan S.L. Liew Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 12 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Liew ( CPSO# 66864 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital
Civic Campus
J157 - 1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 761-4534

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALLAN SYNG-LUAN LIEW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIEW is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1998