Liew, Chiam Leng (CPSO#: 72265)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Indonesian, Malay

Education:McMaster University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
32 CAF Health Services Center
Denison Armouries
1 Yukon Lane
Toronto ON  M3M3J5
Phone: (416) 633 6200 Ext. 3292
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHIAM LENG LIEW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIEW is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2000