Lighter, Mark David (CPSO#: 53850)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Aug 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone: (519) 752-7871
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Brant Community Healthcare System,Willett Site Paris

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 29 May 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK DAVID LIGHTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIGHTER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Other - Rotating Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 1985