Lillicrap, David Paul (CPSO#: 52163)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Pathology
& Molecular Medicine
Queen's University
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone: (613) 533-6342
Fax: (613) 533-2907
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Lillicrap Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 11 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Lillicrap ( CPSO# 52163 )

Business Address:
Department of Pathology &
Molecular Medicine
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone Number: (613) 533-6342

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Hematology Effective: 09 Dec 1982 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID PAUL LILLICRAP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LILLICRAP is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1985