Lilly, Erica Jane (CPSO#: 90976)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Apr 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Asclepios Medical Clinic
Unit 2
750 Taylor Creek Drive
Ottawa ON  K4A 0Z9
Phone: (613) 830-8388
Fax: (613) 830-8588
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sexual Health Centre
179 Clarence Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 5P7
Canada
Phone: (613) 234-4641
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-Elisabeth Bruyere Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 29 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERICA JANE LILLY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LILLY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 2012