Lily, Muriel (CPSO#: 91268)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Mar 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Mar 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
51 Gerry Fitzgerald Drive
North York ON  M3J 3N4
Phone: (416) 739-1562
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Lily Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 10 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Lily ( CPSO# 91268 )

Business Address:
51 Gerry Fitzgerald Drive
North York ON  M3J 3N4
Phone Number: (416) 739-1562

Business Address:
51 Mountainash Road
Brampton ON  L6R 1W4

Business Address:
1880 Eglinton Avenue East
Suite 152
Toronto ON  M1L 2L1

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MURIEL LILY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LILY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 01 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 29 Sep 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Mar 2012