Lim, Caesar Sea Hock (CPSO#: 98202)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Emergency Department
Room 206
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-5058
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Caesar Lim Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 22 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Lim ( CPSO# 98202 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Emergency Department
Room 206
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-5058

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAESAR SEA HOCK LIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2014