Lim, Chern Weng (CPSO#: 90329)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Apr 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Apr 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Malay, Mandarin

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
325 Milner Avenue, Suite 410
Toronto ON  M1B 5N1
Phone: (416) 284-4744
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Chern Lim Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 23 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Lim ( CPSO# 90329 )

Business Address:
Rouge Valley Centenary
407 - 2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9

Business Address:
Suite 410
325 Milner Avenue
Toronto ON  M1B 5N1

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHERN WENG LIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 06 Apr 2009 to 01 May 2009
Elective Trainee - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 May 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 2012