Lim, Choon Guan (CPSO#: 92638)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 17 Sep 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 17 Sep 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:National University of Singapore, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 31 Mar 2010 to 22 Jun 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 23 Jun 2010 to 30 Sep 2010
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 07 Apr 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Sep 2010